Senate | 05/16/2019 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 9 yeas and 25 nays. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |