Senate
|
06/21/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 58, nays 25. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Reported favorably (11-5). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 11 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|