Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Effective date 6/11/2019.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 202.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|