Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Effective date 8/1/2019.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 280.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 4 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Reported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 205. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|