Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Effective date 8/1/2019.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 414.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 160. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|