Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Effective date 8/1/2019.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 403.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
House conferees appointed: Jim Morris, Bishop, and Schexnayder.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Allain, Chabert, and Hewitt.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 179. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|