Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Effective date 7/1/2019.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 181.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|