Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Effective date 8/1/2019.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 438.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
House conferees appointed: Dustin Miller, Hoffmann, and Foil.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Mills, Colomb, and Luneau.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|