Senate | 05/09/2019 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Read by title. By a vote of 21 yeas and 12 nays, the bill failed to receive the required two-thirds vote. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2019 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |