Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
House conferees appointed: Coussan, Abramson, and Jay Morris.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, LaFleur, and Donahue.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 5 nays; ordered re-reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2019
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|