Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Effective date 8/1/2019.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 340.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|