Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 407.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 24. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Discharged from the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 7 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|