Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Effective date 6/30/2019.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 264.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
House conferees appointed: Abramson, Pearson, and Carpenter.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Peterson, Peacock, and Appel.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Reported favorably (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2019
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|