Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 100 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Reported favorably (8-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Reported favorably (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|