LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2019 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR102
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SCR102
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SCR102
Action History
House
05/28/2019
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
House
05/23/2019
Received in the House from the Senate.
Senate
05/23/2019
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
Senate
05/22/2019
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
Senate
05/15/2019
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Senate
05/14/2019
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.