Senate | 05/20/2019 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2019. | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |