Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 71 yeas, 21 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Reported with amendments (6-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|