2019 Regular Session ENROLLED SENATE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 110 BY SENATOR CORTEZ A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION To extend the creation, members, and charge of the Louisiana Supply Chain and Transportation Council as provided in Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 99 of the 2017 Regular Session of the Legislature and as extended in Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 9 of the 2018 Regular Session of the Legislature to study and make recommendations regarding increasing resilience in various modes of transportation through increased communication, collaboration, development of geographic information technologies, and new innovations in transportation resilience. WHEREAS, Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 99 of the 2017 Regular Session of the Legislature created the Louisiana Supply Chain and Transportation Council to make recommendations to the legislature relative to improvements in commercial and workforce transportation to assist in making the Louisiana economy more resilient to disaster and to advise the Department of Transportation and Development on actions necessary to accomplish the following, including any additional recommendations the council may find beneficial: (1) Provide advanced geospatial planning and coordination to predict and avoid points of failure and to inform transportation provided in real-time of routes likely to remain open during and after a disaster; (2) Recommend agreements between providers of different modes of transportation, companies shipping or receiving goods, and public agencies to provide for effective routing of transportation under different scenarios; (3) Support funding and resources to increase utilization of technology and new innovations in lessening the risk of closure, including innovation in water, road, and air modes of transportation; and (4) Increase effectiveness of relationships among local, state, and federal transportation agencies, providers of transportation, shippers and receivers of goods, and their employees, to ensure constant communication and robust predisaster recovery planning. Page 1 of 4 SCR NO. 110 ENROLLED WHEREAS, individual members of the council were appointed, an organizational meeting was held where co-chairpersons were elected, and an executive committee was appointed; and WHEREAS, the council submitted a preliminary report on January 31, 2018, indicating that a final detailed written report could not be finalized and submitted by February 1, 2018; and WHEREAS, the magnitude of the mandate charged to the council has become a project of such proportion not envisioned by Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 99 of the 2017 Regular Session of the Legislature; and WHEREAS, the co-chairmen of the council requested extension of the creation, members, and charge to the council, all as provided in Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 99 of the 2017 Regular Session of the Legislature, and Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 9 of the 2018 Regular Session of the Legislature was enacted to extend the council requiring a final written report on or before March 1, 2019, to the president of the Senate, the speaker of the House of Representatives, the chairmen of the house and senate committees on transportation, highways, and public works, and the secretary of the Department of Transportation and Development; and WHEREAS, the United States government has indicated increased interest in transportation resiliency and indicated that funding for transportation resiliency may become available in the future; and WHEREAS, the Louisiana Supply Chain and Transportation Council, through the efforts of the Capital Region Planning Commission, has successfully secured federal funding in support of this study; and WHEREAS, the existence of the council as a public-private partnership provides a significant advantage to Louisiana when securing and leveraging future and existing federal funding in resiliency and recovery from any future events; and WHEREAS, the council, in its report of March 1, 2019, did recommend that this council be extended through March 2021. THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby accept the preliminary report of the council submitted on March 1, 2019. Page 2 of 4 SCR NO. 110 ENROLLED BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby extend until June 10, 2021, the creation, members, and charge of the Louisiana Supply Chain and Transportation Council to meet, undertake projects, and make recommendations to the legislature relative to improvements in commercial and workforce transportation to assist in making the Louisiana economy more resilient to disaster, all as provided in Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 99 of the 2017 Regular Session of the Legislature and extended by Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 9 of the 2018 Regular Session of the Legislature. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the council shall continue to be supported by the Department of Transportation and Development, assisted by the Department of Economic Development, and shall be a public-private partnership including local, state, and federal agencies, private transport and business associations, and quasi-governmental entities, such as, regional planning districts with the authority to seek and accept grants and other funding sources to benefit the study of the council through the Capital Region Planning Commission. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the members of the council shall continue to serve without compensation, except per diem, expense reimbursement, or other emoluments to which any member may be individually entitled as a member of their respective organization. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Department of Transportation and Development shall continue to provide meeting space for all council meetings. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Capital Region Planning Commission shall continue to provide coordination and administration for the council and to facilitate council meetings. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the council shall submit a final written report and recommendations, no later than March 10, 2021, to the president of the Senate, the speaker of the House of Representatives, the house and senate committees on transportation, highways, and public works, and the secretary of the Department of Transportation and Development. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the secretary of the Department of Transportation and Development, the secretary of the Department of Economic Development, the executive director of the Office of Community Page 3 of 4 SCR NO. 110 ENROLLED Development within the Division of Administration, and the director of the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and Emergency Preparedness. PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES Page 4 of 4