Louisiana 2019 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR110 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

                            2019 Regular Session	ENROLLED
SENATE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 110
BY SENATOR CORTEZ 
A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION
To extend the creation, members, and charge of the Louisiana Supply Chain and
Transportation Council as provided in Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 99 of the
2017 Regular Session of the Legislature and as extended in Senate Concurrent
Resolution No. 9 of the 2018 Regular Session of the Legislature to study and make
recommendations regarding increasing resilience in various modes of transportation
through increased communication, collaboration, development of geographic
information technologies, and new innovations in transportation resilience.
WHEREAS, Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 99 of the 2017 Regular Session of
the Legislature created the Louisiana Supply Chain and Transportation Council to make
recommendations to the legislature relative to improvements in commercial and workforce
transportation to assist in making the Louisiana economy more resilient to disaster and to
advise the Department of Transportation and Development on actions necessary to
accomplish the following, including any additional recommendations the council may find
beneficial:
(1) Provide advanced geospatial planning and coordination to predict and avoid
points of failure and to inform transportation provided in real-time of routes likely to remain
open during and after a disaster;
(2) Recommend agreements between providers of different modes of transportation,
companies shipping or receiving goods, and public agencies to provide for effective routing
of transportation under different scenarios;
(3) Support funding and resources to increase utilization of technology and new
innovations in lessening the risk of closure, including innovation in water, road, and air
modes of transportation; and
(4) Increase effectiveness of relationships among local, state, and federal
transportation agencies, providers of transportation, shippers and receivers of goods, and
their employees, to ensure constant communication and robust predisaster recovery planning.
Page 1 of 4 SCR NO. 110	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, individual members of the council were appointed, an organizational
meeting was held where co-chairpersons were elected, and an executive committee was
appointed; and
WHEREAS, the council submitted a preliminary report on January 31, 2018,
indicating that a final detailed written report could not be finalized and submitted by
February 1, 2018; and
WHEREAS, the magnitude of the mandate charged to the council has become a
project of such proportion not envisioned by Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 99 of the
2017 Regular Session of the Legislature; and
WHEREAS, the co-chairmen of the council requested extension of the creation,
members, and charge to the council, all as provided in Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 99
of the 2017 Regular Session of the Legislature, and Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 9 of
the 2018 Regular Session of the Legislature was enacted to extend the council requiring a
final written report on or before March 1, 2019, to the president of the Senate, the speaker
of the House of Representatives, the chairmen of the house and senate committees on
transportation, highways, and public works, and the secretary of the Department of
Transportation and Development; and
WHEREAS, the United States government has indicated increased interest in
transportation resiliency and indicated that funding for transportation resiliency may become
available in the future; and
WHEREAS, the Louisiana Supply Chain and Transportation Council, through the
efforts of the Capital Region Planning Commission, has successfully secured federal funding
in support of this study; and
WHEREAS, the existence of the council as a public-private partnership provides a
significant advantage to Louisiana when securing and leveraging future and existing federal
funding in resiliency and recovery from any future events; and
WHEREAS, the council, in its report of March 1, 2019, did recommend that this
council be extended through March 2021.
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby
accept the preliminary report of the council submitted on March 1, 2019.
Page 2 of 4 SCR NO. 110	ENROLLED
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby extend
until June 10, 2021, the creation, members, and charge of the Louisiana Supply Chain and
Transportation Council to meet, undertake projects, and make recommendations to the
legislature relative to improvements in commercial and workforce transportation to assist
in making the Louisiana economy more resilient to disaster, all as provided in Senate
Concurrent Resolution No. 99 of the 2017 Regular Session of the Legislature and extended
by Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 9 of the 2018 Regular Session of the Legislature. 
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the council shall continue to be supported by the
Department of Transportation and Development, assisted by the Department of Economic
Development, and shall be a public-private partnership including local, state, and federal
agencies, private transport and business associations, and quasi-governmental entities, such
as, regional planning districts with the authority to seek and accept grants and other funding
sources to benefit the study of the council through the Capital Region Planning Commission.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the members of the council shall continue to
serve without compensation, except per diem, expense reimbursement, or other emoluments
to which any member may be individually entitled as a member of their respective
organization.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Department of Transportation and
Development shall continue to provide meeting space for all council meetings.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Capital Region Planning Commission shall
continue to provide coordination and administration for the council and to facilitate council
meetings.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the council shall submit a final written report
and recommendations, no later than March 10, 2021, to the president of the Senate, the
speaker of the House of Representatives, the house and senate committees on transportation,
highways, and public works, and the secretary of the Department of Transportation and
Development.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the
secretary of the Department of Transportation and Development, the secretary of the
Department of Economic Development, the executive director of the Office of Community
Page 3 of 4 SCR NO. 110	ENROLLED
Development within the Division of Administration, and the director of the Governor's
Office of Homeland Security and Emergency Preparedness.
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Page 4 of 4