Senate | 06/04/2019 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/02/2019 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2019 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/31/2019 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2019 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |