2019 Regular Session ENROLLED SENATE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 113 BY SENATOR GARY SMITH A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION To establish the Public Works Contracts Task Force to study the feasibility of increasing the contract limit applicable to public works contracts. WHEREAS, in Louisiana, contracts for public works exceeding the defined contract limit, including labor and materials, to be done by a public entity shall be advertised and let by contract to the lowest responsible and responsive bidder who bids according to the bidding documents advertised, and no public work shall be done except as provided by law; and WHEREAS, R.S. 38:2212(C) provides that the term "contract limit" is equal to the sum of one hundred fifty thousand dollars per project, including labor, materials, and equipment as per the rates in the latest edition of the Associated Equipment Dealers Rental Rate Book and administrative overhead not to exceed fifteen percent, provided that beginning February 1, 2015, and annually on February first of each subsequent year, the office of facility planning and control within the division of administration is to adjust the "contract limit" by an amount not to exceed the annual percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index in the preceding year and then publish the new contract limit for public works contracts in the Louisiana Register in January of each year; and WHEREAS, the contract limit published in the Louisiana Register in the January 2019 edition is $157,700; and WHEREAS, an increase of the base "contract limit" of one hundred fifty thousand dollars may be needed due to inflation and increased costs of materials and labor. THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana establishes the Public Works Contracts Task Force to study the feasibility of increasing the contract limit applicable to public works contracts. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Public Works Contracts Task Force be comprised of the following members: (1) The president of the Senate, or his designee. Page 1 of 3 SCR NO. 113 ENROLLED (2) The speaker of the House of Representatives, or his designee. (3) The chairman of the Senate Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works, or another member of the committee designated by the chair. (4) The chairman of the House Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works, or another member of the committee designated by the chair. (5) The executive director of the office of facility planning and control within the division of administration, or his designee. (6) A representative of the Louisiana Associated General Contractors, Inc. (7) A representative of the Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc. Louisiana Chapter. (8) A representative of the American Council of Engineering Companies of Louisiana, Inc. (9) A representative of the Police Jury Association of Louisiana, Inc. (10) A representative of The Louisiana Municipal Association. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby urge and request that the members' organizations appoint representatives who are involved in and possess a working knowledge of the public works contract process. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the executive director of the division of administration, office of facility planning and control, or his designee, shall act as chairman of the task force. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the members of this task force shall serve without compensation, except per diem or expense reimbursement to which they may be individually entitled as members of the organizations they represent. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a majority of the total membership shall constitute a quorum of the task force and any official action by the task force shall require an affirmative vote of a majority of the quorum present and voting. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the names of the members chosen or designated by the member organizations shall be submitted to the chairman of the task force no later than August 15, 2019, and that the chairman shall thereafter call the first meeting of the task force no later than September 15, 2019. Page 2 of 3 SCR NO. 113 ENROLLED BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the task force shall meet as necessary and shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the chairmen of the house and senate committees on transportation, highways and public works, no later than January 31, 2020. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the task force shall terminate not later than June 1, 2020. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that copies of this Resolution shall be transmitted to the executive director of the division of administration, office of facility planning and control, the Louisiana Associated General Contractors, Inc., the Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc. Louisiana Chapter, the American Council of Engineering Companies of Louisiana, Inc., the Police Jury Association of Louisiana, Inc., and The Louisiana Municipal Association. PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES Page 3 of 3