Senate | 06/06/2019 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. | ||
House | 06/04/2019 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2019 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/02/2019 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 06/02/2019 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2019 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2019 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2019 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |