House
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
By a vote of 50 yeas, 45 nays, the House refused to suspend the rules to consider the Conference Committee report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
House conferees appointed: Edmonds, Foil, and Carmody.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: White, Martiny, and Peacock.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|