Senate | 05/09/2019 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 9 yeas and 26 nays. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |