Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 96 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Reported favorably (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported favorably (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|