Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 101 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Reported with amendments (7-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported with amendments (9-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|