Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/30/2019.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 100 yeas, 1 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|