Senate | 06/04/2019 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/02/2019 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2019 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/30/2019. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 97 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19. | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 6 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |