LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2019 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR177
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SR177
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR177
Action History
Senate
06/04/2019
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Senate
05/30/2019
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted.
Senate
05/30/2019
Rules suspended.
Senate
05/29/2019
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
Senate
05/23/2019
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Senate
05/22/2019
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.