Senate | 06/04/2019 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2019. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2019 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2019 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |