Louisiana 2019 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR188 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

                            2019 Regular Session	ENROLLED
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 188
BY SENATOR GARY SMITH 
A RESOLUTION
To establish the Public Works Contracts Task Force to study the feasibility of increasing the
contract limit applicable to public works contracts.
WHEREAS, in Louisiana, contracts for public works exceeding the defined contract
limit, including labor and materials, to be done by a public entity shall be advertised and let
by contract to the lowest responsible and responsive bidder who bids according to the
bidding documents advertised, and no public work shall be done except as provided by law;
and
WHEREAS, R.S. 38:2212(C) provides that the term "contract limit" is equal to the
sum of one hundred fifty thousand dollars per project, including labor, materials, and
equipment as per the rates in the latest edition of the Associated Equipment Dealers Rental
Rate Book and administrative overhead not to exceed fifteen percent, provided that
beginning February 1, 2015, and annually on February first of each subsequent year, the
office of facility planning and control within the division of administration is to adjust the
"contract limit" by an amount not to exceed the annual percentage increase in the Consumer
Price Index in the preceding year and then publish the new contract limit for public works
contracts in the Louisiana Register in January of each year; and
WHEREAS, the contract limit published in the Louisiana Register in the January
2019 edition is $157,700; and 
WHEREAS, an increase of the base "contract limit" of one hundred fifty thousand
dollars may be needed due to inflation and increased costs of materials and labor.
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana
establishes the Public Works Contracts Task Force to study the feasibility of increasing the
contract limit applicable to public works contracts.
Page 1 of 3 SR NO. 188	ENROLLED
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Public Works Contracts Task Force be
comprised of the following members:
(1)  The president of the Senate or his designee.
(2)  The chairman of the Senate Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public
Works, or another member of the committee designated by the chair.
(3)  The executive director of the office of facility planning and control within the
division of administration or his designee.
(4)  A representative of the Louisiana Associated General Contractors, Inc.
(5)  A representative of the Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc., Louisiana
Chapter.
(6)  A representative of the American Council of Engineering Companies of
Louisiana, Inc.
(7)  A representative of the Police Jury Association of Louisiana, Inc.
(8)  A representative of The Louisiana Municipal Association.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana does
hereby urge and request that the members' organizations appoint representatives who are
involved in and possess a working knowledge of the public works contract process. 
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the executive director of the division of
administration, office of facility planning and control, or his designee, shall act as chairman
of the task force.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the members of this task force shall serve
without compensation, except per diem or expense reimbursement to which they may be
individually entitled as members of the organizations they represent.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a majority of the total membership shall
constitute a quorum of the task force and any official action by the task force shall require
an affirmative vote of a majority of the quorum present and voting.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the names of the members chosen or designated
by the member organizations shall be submitted to the chairman of the task force no later
than August 15, 2019, and that the chairman shall thereafter call the first meeting of the task
force no later than September 15, 2019.
Page 2 of 3 SR NO. 188	ENROLLED
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the task force shall meet as necessary and shall
submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the chairmen of the house and senate
committees on transportation, highways and public works, no later than January 31, 2020.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the task force shall terminate not later than
June 1, 2020.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that copies of this Resolution shall be transmitted
to the executive director of the division of administration, office of facility planning and
control, the Louisiana Associated General Contractors, Inc., the Associated Builders and
Contractors, Inc., Louisiana Chapter, the American Council of Engineering Companies of
Louisiana, Inc., the Police Jury Association of Louisiana, Inc., and the Louisiana Municipal
Association.
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
Page 3 of 3