LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2019 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR42
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SR42
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR42
Action History
Senate
04/29/2019
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2019.
Senate
04/24/2019
Read by title and adopted.
Senate
04/24/2019
Called from the Calendar.
Senate
04/22/2019
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Senate
04/17/2019
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.