Senate | 05/08/2019 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |