House
|
07/13/2020
|
Effective date: 08/01/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
07/13/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 27.
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 4. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 4 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Allain, McMath, and Reese.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
House conferees appointed: Stefanski, Bishop, and Wright.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2020
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2020
|
By a vote of 13 yeas and 25 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and rejected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2020
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/16/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Reported favorably (13-1).
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|