House
|
07/09/2020
|
Effective date: 07/01/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
07/09/2020
|
Signed by the Governor with one or more line-item vetoes. Becomes Act No. 11.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2020
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/29/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2020
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 2 for 06/10/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2020
|
Reported favorably (20-0).
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|