House
|
06/17/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 29. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2020
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 25. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/16/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Reported favorably (11-5).
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|