House | 06/17/2020 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/15/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/17/20. | ||
House | 06/15/2020 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/15/2020 | Discharged from the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 06/11/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 06/10/2020 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 06/04/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |