House
|
06/25/2020
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 5.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 8. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 19. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/11/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2020
|
Reported with amendments (18-0).
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|