Senate | 06/18/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2020 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 06/17/2020 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 38. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 06/17/2020 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 06/16/2020 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/11/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/16/20. | ||
House | 06/11/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/10/2020 | Reported favorably (11-3). | ||
House | 06/04/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |