House | 06/16/2020 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/16/2020 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 06/15/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/16/20. | ||
House | 06/15/2020 | Notice given. | ||
House | 06/11/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/15/20. | ||
House | 06/11/2020 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/10/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/11/20. | ||
House | 06/10/2020 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/09/2020 | Reported with amendments (20-0). | ||
House | 06/05/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |