House
|
07/13/2020
|
Effective date: 07/01/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
07/13/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 30.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2020
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/29/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/16/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|