Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 18. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2020
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 45, nays 44. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/17/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2020
|
Discharged from the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Reported with amendments (8-6).
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|