House
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, McMath, and Harris.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
House conferees appointed: Garofalo, Gregory Miller, and Seabaugh.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 72, nays 26, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2020
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/29/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 25. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/15/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2020
|
Reported with amendments (9-4-1).
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|