House
|
06/25/2020
|
Effective date: 06/25/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 3.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/11/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2020
|
Reported favorably (11-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|