Senate | 06/18/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2020 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 06/17/2020 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 06/17/2020 | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. | ||
House | 06/15/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/17/20. | ||
House | 06/15/2020 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/11/2020 | Reported with amendments (11-0). | ||
House | 06/09/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 06/08/2020 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |