House
|
07/16/2020
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 3, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2020
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/29/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/18/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2020
|
Reported with amendments (9-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2020
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|