House
|
07/13/2020
|
Effective date: 01/01/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
07/13/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 37.
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 4 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 86, nays 15. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice House recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
The House recommitted the bill to Conference Committee by a vote of 95 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
The Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
House conferees appointed: Schexnayder, Gregory Miller, and Stefanski.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/30/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 8 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2020
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Cortez, Peacock, and Luneau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/24/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 22. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/15/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2020
|
Reported with amendments (10-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|