House
|
07/08/2020
|
Effective date: 03/11/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
07/08/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 9.
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 55, nays 40. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Fields, Pope, and Mizell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
House conferees appointed: Mincey, Bishop, and Schexnayder.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 15, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 17. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/23/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2020
|
Reported with amendments (14-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2020
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2020
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|