LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2020 1st Special Session
House
Bills
HB60
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB60
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2020 1st Special Session
Louisiana House Bill HB60
Action History
House
06/18/2020
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
House
06/16/2020
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/18/20.
House
06/16/2020
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
06/15/2020
Reported with amendments (9-3).
House
06/10/2020
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
House
06/09/2020
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.