Senate | 06/22/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2020 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 06/18/2020 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 06/17/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/18/20. | ||
House | 06/17/2020 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/16/2020 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 06/11/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 06/10/2020 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |